+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/4/2019 1:01 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/27/2019 6:08 PM)