+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce, then Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.