+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 310, 2019 Laws.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Taylor.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Helt. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Hayden; Excused, 1--Leif.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 23, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (5/3/2019 2:17 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/1/2019 2:44 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (1/29/2019 9:37 AM)