+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 1, 2021.
- Chapter 136, 2021 Laws.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Evans, Helm, Sanchez.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2021 Calendar.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Manning Jr, Thomsen.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/17/2021 8:55 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/17/2021 8:55 AM)