+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Bates, Devlin.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor