+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, August 8, 2017.
- Chapter 700, 2017 Laws.
On August 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Heard, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Hayden.
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On July 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Olsen.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Amendments distributed.)
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (7/1/2017 4:55:03 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (5/26/2017 1:30:50 PM)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor