+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to withdraw from committee on Rules failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 17--Bates, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Beyer, Olsen.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor