+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/12/2017 12:54:27 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor