+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, September 25, 2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 134, 2021 Laws.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 7--Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Holvey, Noble, Power, Sanchez, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to May 20, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.