+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Housing.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -3
Proposed (5/31/2019 4:27 PM)