+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Thatcher. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from 03-24 Calendar and placed on 05-07 Calendar on voice vote.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Whitsett. Adopted.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Boone, Gallegos, McKeown, Rayfield.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 27, 2015 Calendar.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor