+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On October 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On October 3, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On October 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Resolution read in its entirety.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Dingfelder, Prozanski, Shields, Starr.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
- Referred to Special Session.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Hoyle, McLane. Adopted.Ayes, 53; Excused, 7--Cameron, Clem, Greenlick, Holvey, Smith, Thatcher, Unger.
On October 1, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
- Work Session held.
On September 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Special Session.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Special Session
Type:
Primary Sponsor