+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Doherty.
- Rules suspended. Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Barnhart. Adopted. Ayes, 51; Nays, 2--Doherty, Rayfield; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor