+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Olsen.
- Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Hack. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, McLane.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 9, 2017 Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor