+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On July 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 3, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted.Ayes, 30.
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Huffman. Adopted.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Rayfield.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor