+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Thatcher.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Evans. Adopted.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Reardon, Stark.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.