+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Beyer. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Hansell, Winters.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-26 by unanimous consent.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Olson. Adopted.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Heard, Kennemer.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 12, 2016 Calendar.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor