+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Be adopted and be referred to Rules by prior reference.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services, then Rules.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Nearman, Meek. Adopted. Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--McKeown, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Helfrich, Nathanson, Piluso, Wilson.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 19, 2018 Calendar.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 16, 2018 Calendar.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Subsequent referral to Rules rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Rules be rescinded.
- Work Session held.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -4
Adopted (2/12/2018 4:58:13 PM)