+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Hansell. Adopted.Ayes, 30.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Nathanson. Adopted.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Gilliam, Keny-Guyer, McKeown.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 11, 2015 Calendar.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 7, 2015 Calendar.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor