+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/3/2013 9:20:46 AM)