+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Final reading. Carried by Lieber. Adopted. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Findley, Heard, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Johnson.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do adopt.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Schouten. Adopted. Ayes, 47; Nays, 6--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Post, Reschke, Smith G; Excused, 7--Alonso Leon, Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2021 Calendar.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 24, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 22, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.