+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 3, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On July 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 3, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Devlin, Girod, President Courtney.
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Weidner. Adopted.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Greenlick; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Speaker Kotek.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor