+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and readopted measure.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Davis, Gorsek, Olson.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Shields, Winters.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments to the A-Eng. resolution. (Printed B-Eng.)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Evans. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barton, Boone.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules by prior reference.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (8)
Amendment -A8
Adopted (2/26/2016 2:03:44 PM)
Amendment -A9
Proposed (2/26/2016 2:03:44 PM)
Amendment -A6
Proposed (2/26/2016 2:03:44 PM)
Amendment -A5
Proposed (2/26/2016 7:14:41 AM)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (2/26/2016 7:14:41 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (1/28/2016 4:56:59 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/8/2016 3:41:52 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/3/2016 12:17:58 PM)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor