+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Gelser. Adopted.Ayes, 30.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Reardon. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Stark.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor