+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Monroe, Thatcher.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Wilson. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Smith G.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 27, 2017 Calendar.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor