+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and readopted measure. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barreto, Boone, Hayden, Noble.
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Roblan. Adopted. Ayes, 30.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-30 by unanimous consent.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Smith DB. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Gorsek.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/26/2017 9:42:39 AM)