+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Taylor. Adopted. Ayes, 26; Excused, 3--Hansell, Johnson, Steiner Hayward.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do adopt.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Power. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 8, 2019 Calendar.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.