+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Hansell. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Girod, Kruse, Winters.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Olson. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Witt.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 14, 2018 Calendar.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.