+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 598, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-18 by unanimous consent.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Evans, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Wilson; Excused, 2--Barker, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #6558
5/11/2015 12:47:39 PM
Amendment #7305
6/3/2015 12:21:29 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor