+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 586, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017.
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 20; nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; excused, 3--Monroe, Roblan, Thomsen.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-30 by unanimous consent.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Nearman, Post, Reschke, Wilson; Excused, 2--Boone, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bentz, Speaker Kotek.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Power.
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/20/2017 7:06:16 PM)