+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 562, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 3--Moore-Green, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Noble; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fahey, Speaker Kotek.
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/10/2021 10:44 AM)