+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 37, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Linthicum; Excused, 1--Bentz.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Bynum, Keny-Guyer, Leif, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Salinas.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 1, 2019 Calendar.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.