+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 23, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 534, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2019.
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Bentz.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by McLane.
- Second reading.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/6/2019 1:28 PM)