+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 564, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Hass, Olsen.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith.
- Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 12--Barton, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Greenlick, Harker, Hicks, Jenson, Johnson, Krieger, Parrish, Weidner.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Ways And Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor