+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 581, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017.
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Thatcher; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hayden.
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 1--Johnson; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Fahey, Gomberg, Marsh, Nearman, Smith G, Speaker Kotek.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing cancelled.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing cancelled.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/22/2017 2:36:59 PM)