+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 92, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 5--Lewis, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Sprenger; Excused, 1--Heard.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/20/2017 1:39:37 PM)