+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 14, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 671, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 28; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G.
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 5--Keny-Guyer, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 4--Barreto, Clem, Hernandez, Reardon.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (6/25/2019 2:09 PM)