+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 580, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017.
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 10, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Johnson declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen.
On July 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G.
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 19--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Clem, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 2--Boone, Williamson; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Hernandez, Lively, Smith Warner, Whisnant.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/28/2017 10:28:46 AM)