+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 666, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 7, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 4--Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr; excused, 2--Boquist, Close.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Barton, Unger; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner.
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor