+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 593, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-18 by unanimous consent.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith.
- Passed.Ayes, 37; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Kennemer, Krieger, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Barker, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #
6/3/2015 12:15:46 PM
Amendment #7303
6/3/2015 12:15:46 PM
Amendment #6946
5/26/2015 4:06:37 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor