+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 14, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 663, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Olsen, Thatcher; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 19--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Helt; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Nosse, Rayfield.
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bonham.
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 17, 2019 Calendar.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/6/2019 6:45 PM)