+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 191, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Girod declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Boquist, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Burdick.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Esquivel, Weidner; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Rayfield; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nosse.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #6388
4/29/2015 7:04:04 PM
Amendment #6299
4/22/2015 12:36:27 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor