+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 426, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 01, 2021.
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 5--Bonham, Post, Reschke, Wilde, Witt; Excused, 3--Hayden, Lewis, Valderrama.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2021 Calendar.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/3/2021 11:11 AM)