+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 505, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Linthicum, Thatcher.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Sprenger, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Boone, Gorsek.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing cancelled.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/1/2017 1:46:07 PM)