+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 496, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 2--Johnson, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Barton, Dembrow; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fagan, Speaker Kotek.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor