+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 468, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 14, 2021.
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Smith DB, Wright; Excused, 1--Noble.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/10/2021 10:38 AM)