+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 684, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2015.
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 5--Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Olsen.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 10--Barreto, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, McLane, Post, Weidner; Excused, 2--Evans, Smith.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #7453
6/10/2015 9:59:15 AM
Amendment #7536
6/15/2015 7:12:22 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor