+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 14, (2020 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2021.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (6/25/2020 11:46 AM)