+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 12, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Hayden, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Leif.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 4--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard; Excused, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen.
- Vote explanation filed by Boquist.
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (21)
Amendment -41
Adopted (6/26/2020 2:08 PM)
Amendment -39
Proposed (6/25/2020 12:36 PM)
Amendment -33
Combined (6/25/2020 10:41 AM)
Amendment -34
Combined (6/25/2020 9:27 AM)
Amendment -36
Combined (6/25/2020 11:40 AM)
Amendment -38
Proposed (6/25/2020 11:19 AM)
Amendment -31
Proposed (6/25/2020 8:46 AM)
Amendment -23
Combined (6/24/2020 4:47 PM)
Amendment -26
Combined (6/24/2020 4:47 PM)
Amendment -13
Proposed (6/24/2020 4:37 PM)
Amendment -30
Combined (6/24/2020 4:09 PM)
Amendment -10
Proposed (6/24/2020 2:28 PM)
Amendment -16
Proposed (6/24/2020 11:44 AM)
Amendment -25
Proposed (6/24/2020 12:19 PM)
Amendment -27
Combined (6/24/2020 12:26 PM)
Amendment -28
Proposed (6/24/2020 3:53 PM)
Amendment -14
Proposed (6/24/2020 11:39 AM)
Amendment -12
Proposed (6/24/2020 11:39 AM)
Amendment -11
Proposed (6/24/2020 11:39 AM)
Amendment -7
Combined (6/24/2020 10:49 AM)
Amendment -8
Combined (6/24/2020 9:05 AM)