+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 10, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
- Vote explanations filed by Boquist, Prozanski.
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boshart Davis, Mitchell, Moore-Green.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 13--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Wallan, Wilson; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Sprenger.
- Second reading.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Referred to The First Special Session of 2020.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.